Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Edward Murray

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wollongong, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1920Born
21 Jul 194525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
5 Jun 197555.3AppointedBishop of Wollongong, Australia
21 Jul 197555.4Ordained BishopBishop of Wollongong, Australia
12 Apr 199676.1RetiredBishop of Wollongong, Australia
21 Apr 201393.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Wollongong, Australia

MicroData Summary for William Edward Murray
Bishop William Edward Murray (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wollongong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeichhardt

  • a priest for 67.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • d: CB, 22 Apr 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast