Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Jobst, S.A.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Broome


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1920BornFrankenburg, Germany
9 Jul 195030.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
13 Jan 195938.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kimberley in Western Australia
13 Jan 195938.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Pitanae
19 Mar 195939.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pitanae
7 Jun 196646.3AppointedBishop of Broome, Australia
3 Nov 199575.7RetiredBishop of Broome, Australia
5 Jul 201494.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Broome, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Jobst:
Bishop John Jobst S.A.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Broome

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 55.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 20
  • d: CB, 7 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Jul 2014