Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignazio Cannav˛

Archbishop Emeritus of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1921 BornFiumefreddo di Sicilia
5 Nov 194422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Acireale, Italy
31 Oct 197048.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Acireale, Italy
31 Oct 197048.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Octava
13 Dec 197049.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Octava
21 Feb 197654.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Messina, Italy
20 Dec 197655.0AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
3 Jun 197755.5SucceededArchbishop of Messina, Italy
10 Dec 197756.0AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
30 Sep 198664.8AppointedArchbishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
17 May 199775.4RetiredArchbishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Cannav˛:
Archbishop Ignazio Cannav˛ (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013