Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Umberto Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Asti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1879BornCasorzo
29 Jun 190223.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 192142.1AppointedBishop of Susa, Italy
14 Aug 192142.3Ordained BishopBishop of Susa, Italy
6 Nov 192142.5InstalledBishop of Susa, Italy
14 May 193253.1AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
6 Aug 195273.3DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Umberto Rossi:
Bishop Umberto Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Asti

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015