Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittorio Moietta

Deceased

Bishop of Nicastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1913BornBrusasco
27 Jun 193724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Casale Monferrato, Italy
18 Jan 196147.8AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
19 Mar 196147.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
1 Apr 196350.0DiedBishop of Nicastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Moietta:
Bishop Vittorio Moietta (born , died ) Bishop of Nicastro

  • a priest for 25.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1962
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013