Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dante Carlos Sandrelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Formosa, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1922Born
27 Jul 194725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Argentina
2 Jan 197653.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Formosa, Argentina
2 Jan 197653.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Germania in Dacia
25 Apr 197653.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germania in Dacia
31 Mar 197855.8AppointedBishop of Formosa, Argentina
14 Jan 199875.6RetiredBishop of Formosa, Argentina
7 Dec 200280.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Formosa, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Dante Carlos Sandrelli
Bishop Dante Carlos Sandrelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Formosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCortona, Italy

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 3 Oct 2018

Quantcast