Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Marcio Camus Larenas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Linares


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1927BornValparaiso
21 Sep 195730.7Ordained PriestPriest of Valparaíso, Chile
31 Jan 196841.0AppointedBishop of Copiapó, Chile
3 Mar 196841.1Ordained BishopBishop of Copiapó, Chile
11 Dec 197649.9AppointedBishop of Linares, Chile
17 Apr 197750.3InstalledBishop of Linares, Chile
17 Jan 200376.0RetiredBishop of Linares, Chile
16 Mar 201487.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Linares, Chile

MicroData Summary for Carlos Marcio Camus Larenas:
Bishop Carlos Marcio Camus Larenas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Linares

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 46.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 17 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014