Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Óscar Armando Campos Contreras

Bishop of Ciudad Guzmán, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1947 Born
27 Dec 197831.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas, México
23 May 200658.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
23 May 200658.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Summa
12 Jul 200658.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Summa
2 Feb 201062.3AppointedBishop of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca, México
23 Mar 201062.5InstalledBishop of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca, México
25 Sep 201770.0AppointedBishop of Ciudad Guzmán, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Óscar Armando Campos Contreras
Bishop Óscar Armando Campos Contreras (born ) Bishop of Ciudad Guzmán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara
Ordained PriestSan Marcos, Cathedral, Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Diocese of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas
Ordained BishopSeminario Pontificio de la Santa Cruz, Oaxaca, Archdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad Guzmán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 May 2006
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,206
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2010
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast