Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Paccaroni, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1749BornFirman
21 Dec 177122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Jan 179849.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
2 Feb 179849.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Paccaroni:
Bishop Vincenzo Paccaroni O.S.B. , Titular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015