Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Ubaldo Maria Romanzi

Deceased

Bishop of Lacedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1738³BornSalvitelle
5 Jun 176224.0Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 179759.4SelectedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
29 Jan 179859.6ConfirmedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
2 Feb 179859.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
30 Oct 181678.4DiedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Ubaldo Maria Romanzi
Bishop Francesco Ubaldo Maria Romanzi (born , died ) Bishop of Lacedonia

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 252
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 8 Mar 2016