Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria de Mellis

Deceased

Bishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1740BornLauria
31 May 176020.3Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 179757.7SelectedBishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy
29 Jan 179858.0ConfirmedBishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy
2 Feb 179858.0Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy
1814¹73.9DiedBishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria de Mellis
Bishop Giuseppe Maria de Mellis (born , died 1814) Bishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 94
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 8 Mar 2016