Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvestro Scarani

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

Titular Bishop of Dulma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1731BornVelletri
14 Sep 180069.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Sep 180069.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 180069.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
22 Dec 180069.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dulma
4 Jan 180169.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dulma
1807¹75.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Silvestro Scarani:
Bishop Silvestro Scarani (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

  • a priest for 6.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 181

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013