Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Bandini

Deceased

Bishop of Larino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1733BornSalerno
3 Apr 175622.9Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 179764.4SelectedBishop of Larino, Italy
29 Jan 179864.7ConfirmedBishop of Larino, Italy
2 Feb 179864.7Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
1806¹72.6DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philip Bandini
Bishop Philip Bandini (born , died 1806) Bishop of Larino

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 253
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 8 Mar 2016