Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo Mele

Deceased

Bishop of Tropea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1738³BornSan Gregorio
19 Dec 176123.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 179758.9SelectedBishop of Tropea, Italy
29 Jan 179859.1ConfirmedBishop of Tropea, Italy
2 Feb 179859.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tropea, Italy
6 Feb 181778.2DiedBishop of Tropea, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Mele
Bishop Gerardo Mele (born , died ) Bishop of Tropea

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 419
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 8 Mar 2016