Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuele di Tommaso

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1721Born
26 Mar 174624.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 177149.9AppointedBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy
21 Dec 177149.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy
1807¹85.0DiedBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emanuele di Tommaso
Bishop Emanuele di Tommaso (born , died 1807) Bishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,771, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast