Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Morosini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1719Born
25 Jul 174324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Feb 176949.5SelectedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
28 May 177050.8ConfirmedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
3 Jun 177050.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
14 Dec 177253.3AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
16 Feb 177353.5InstalledBishop of Verona, Italy
18 Aug 178970.0DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Morosini
Bishop Giovanni Morosini O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Verona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 170, and Page 439
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018