Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventura Bernardi

Deceased

Bishop of Ossero (Osor)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1701³BornSplit
13 Apr 172423.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Apr 172423.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 175755.9AppointedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
6 Jan 175755.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
21 Feb 178180.0DiedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Bernardi:
Bishop Bonaventura Bernardi (born , died ) Bishop of Ossero (Osor)

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 109
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 19 Nov 2015