Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Methone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1716BornBrescia
19 Jul 173922.9Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
22 Aug 174630.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Methone
11 Sep 174630.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Methone
14 Mar 179174.5DiedTitular Bishop of Methone

MicroData Summary for Alexander Fé:
Bishop Alexander (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Methone

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 287
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,473
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 11 Dec 2015