Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Carlo Molinari

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Belgium

Titular Archbishop of Damascus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1715BornMilano, Italy
21 Dec 175338.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Dec 175338.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jan 175438.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
27 Jan 175438.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Damascus
9 Feb 175438.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
31 Mar 176347.6DiedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Carlo Molinari
Archbishop Giovanni Carlo Molinari (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Belgium

  • a priest for 9.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 191
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 250

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Nov 2016