Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Carsana

Deceased

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1718BornZadar
19 Nov 174123.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 177152.8AppointedBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
29 Sep 177152.8Ordained BishopBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
6 Jun 177455.5AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
31 Jan 180182.2DiedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Carsana:
Archbishop Giovanni Carsana (born , died ) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 189, and Page 241
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015