Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Duranti

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Chytri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1674Born
3 Sep 173056.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 174369.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Chytri
19 May 174369.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chytri

MicroData Summary for Andrea Duranti
Bishop Andrea Duranti (born ) Titular Bishop of Chytri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrescia, Diocese of Brescia, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,874
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 165
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast