Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Domenico Sceriman, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1729BornVenezia
30 Jul 175222.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
28 Sep 177646.9SelectedBishop of Caorle, Italy
16 Dec 177647.2ConfirmedBishop of Caorle, Italy
22 Dec 177647.2Ordained BishopBishop of Caorle, Italy
13 Dec 179465.2SelectedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
1 Jun 179565.6ConfirmedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
12 Jun 180676.7DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stefano Domenico Sceriman:
Bishop Stefano Domenico Sceriman O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Chioggia

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 146, and Page 170
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1776, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015