Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurence Arthur Nihill

Deceased

Bishop of Kilfenora, Ireland

Apostolic Administrator of Kilmacduagh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1726Born
31 Jul 174721.1EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
7 Jun 175832.0IncardinatedPriest of Limerick, Ireland
23 Dec 178357.5AppointedBishop of Kilfenora, Ireland
23 Dec 178357.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kilmacduagh, Ireland
1 May 178457.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kilfenora, Ireland
29 Jun 179569.0DiedBishop of Kilfenora, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Laurence Arthur Nihill
Bishop Laurence Arthur Nihill (born , died ) Bishop of Kilfenora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimerick, Diocese of Limerick
Ordained BishopSaint Michael, Church, Limerick, Diocese of Limerick
Buried Place (Original)St. Fachtnan, Cathedral, Kilfenora, Diocese of Kilfenora

  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 201
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,221
  • b/c3: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1784, Number 37
  • b/c23: CB, 10 Mar 2019
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,083
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 88, and Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast