Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph Franz von Buseck

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1724Born
7 Apr 179570.2SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
9 May 179570.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 May 179570.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 179570.4ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
16 Aug 179570.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
28 Sep 180580.7DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Christoph Franz von Buseck (VIAF: 77207428)
Bishop Christoph Franz von Buseck (born , died ) Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJagstberg
Ordained BishopHopkapelle, Bamberg, Diocese of Bamberg

  • a priest for 10.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,795, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 114
  • od/op/c013: CB, 16 Jun 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Number 20,141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast