Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio Noguer Carmona

Bishop Emeritus of Huelva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1931 BornSevilla
17 Jun 195625.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Sep 197645.7AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
17 Oct 197645.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
19 Oct 199059.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Huelva, Spain
27 Oct 199362.8SucceededBishop of Huelva, Spain
17 Jul 200675.5RetiredBishop of Huelva, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Noguer Carmona:
Bishop Ignacio Noguer Carmona (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Huelva

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Huelva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013