Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antonio Infantes Florido

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Córdoba, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1920Born
19 May 195131.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 196747.4AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
21 Sep 196747.6Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
25 May 197858.3AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
15 Mar 199676.1RetiredBishop of Córdoba, Spain
6 Nov 200585.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Infantes Florido
Bishop José Antonio Infantes Florido (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Córdoba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlmadén de la Plata

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast