Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Brufau Maciá, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Pedro Sula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1922BornVilanova de Bellpuig, Spain
25 Jan 194826.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
15 Mar 196644.2AppointedBishop of San Pedro Sula, Honduras
29 Jun 196644.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Pedro Sula, Honduras
15 Sep 199371.7ResignedBishop of San Pedro Sula, Honduras
17 Aug 199674.6DiedBishop Emeritus of San Pedro Sula, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Jaime Brufau Maciá:
Bishop Jaime Brufau Maciá C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Pedro Sula

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013