Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angel Garachana Pérez, C.M.F.

Bishop Emeritus of San Pedro Sula, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1944 Born
19 Mar 197227.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
11 Nov 199450.1AppointedBishop of San Pedro Sula, Honduras
3 Feb 199550.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Pedro Sula, Honduras
26 Jan 202378.3RetiredBishop of San Pedro Sula, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Angel Garachana Pérez
(WikiData: Q531661)
Bishop Angel Garachana Pérez C.M.F. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Pedro Sula

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarbadillo de Herreros, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, San Pedro Sula, Diocese of San Pedro Sula

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Pedro Sula.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,485
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jan 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 22 May 2023