Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Mario Avila del Aguila, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jalapa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1924BornGuatemala
7 Nov 194824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
3 Feb 197853.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of El Petén, Guatemala
3 Dec 198258.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasai
15 Jan 198358.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nasai
3 Feb 198459.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of El Petén, Guatemala
29 Jan 198762.7AppointedBishop of Jalapa, Guatemala
5 Dec 200177.6RetiredBishop of Jalapa, Guatemala
3 May 200884.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Jalapa, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Jorge Mario Avila del Aguila:
Bishop Jorge Mario Avila del Aguila C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jalapa

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015