Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas

Dioecesis Taxensis-Carabellensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 18 April 1983
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Bahia
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 18,574 (7,174 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste III
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Rua Eurico Gaspar Dutra 38, 45995-112 Teixeira de Freitas, BA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (073)3291-1283
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Caravelas
21 July 1962ErectedDiocese of Ilhéus Diocese of Caravelas (erected)
Diocese of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas
18 April 1983Name ChangedDiocese of Caravelas Diocese of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas
12 June 1996Territory LostDiocese of Itabuna
Diocese of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas
Diocese of Eunápolis (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Caravelas
1965400,000404,00099.0%151526,666512ap1967
1970500,000600,00083.3%212123,809231312ap1971
1976570,000600,00095.0%1161733,529193313ap1977
1977432,000455,00094.9%2182021,600223814ap1981
Diocese of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas
1990462,000543,00085.1%5182320,086193619ap1991
1999290,000340,00085.3%1392213,181102518ap2000
2000290,000340,00085.3%1682412,08392718ap2001
2001290,000340,00085.3%1792611,153103018ap2002
2002292,000364,72080.1%19102910,068113039ap2003
2003292,000364,72080.1%1892710,814103039ap2004
2004292,000364,72080.1%19102910,068123039ap2005
2010313,000397,00078.8%2811398,025134125ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014