Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Messias dos Reis Silveira

Bishop of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1958 Born
11 Aug 199233.6Ordained PriestPriest of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil
3 Jan 200748.0AppointedBishop of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
11 Mar 200748.2Ordained BishopBishop of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
25 Mar 200748.2InstalledBishop of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
14 Nov 201859.8AppointedBishop of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Messias dos Reis Silveira (VIAF: 49146029501735821293)
Bishop Messias dos Reis Silveira (born ) Bishop of Teófilo Otoni

EventPlace
Birth PlacePassos, Diocese of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais
Ordained BishopGinásio Poliesportivo, Guaxupé, Diocese of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Teófilo Otoni.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,346
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Nov 2018

Quantcast