Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Rösch

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1911Born
8 Apr 193927.4Ordained PriestPriest of Goya, Argentina
12 Jun 196149.6AppointedBishop of Concordia, Argentina
29 Oct 196150.0Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia, Argentina
18 Nov 196150.0InstalledBishop of Concordia, Argentina
21 Aug 197664.8DiedBishop of Concordia, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Rösch
Bishop Ricardo Rösch (born , died ) Bishop of Concordia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarktredwitz, Germany

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast