Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Mestres

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paraná

Titular Bishop of Dardanus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1912BornCorrientes
29 Jul 193421.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 197461.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paraná, Argentina
7 Mar 197461.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
21 Apr 197461.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
31 Oct 198774.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Paraná, Argentina
7 Jun 199077.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paraná, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José María Mestres:
Bishop José María Mestres (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paraná

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013