Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Joseph Winter

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA

Titular Bishop of Uthina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1930 Born
17 Dec 195525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
21 Dec 198858.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
21 Dec 198858.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Uthina
13 Feb 198958.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uthina
20 May 200575.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for William Joseph Winter
Bishop William Joseph Winter (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh

EventPlace
Birth PlacePittsburgh

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pittsburgh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018