Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Eugene Brandt

Bishop Emeritus of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1939 Born
19 Dec 196930.7Ordained PriestPriest of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
2 Jan 200464.7AppointedBishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
4 Mar 200464.9Ordained BishopBishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
24 Apr 201576.0RetiredBishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Eugene Brandt
Bishop Lawrence Eugene Brandt (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Greensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCharleston, WV

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Greensburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,542
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast