Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Bonneguise

Deceased

Bishop of Arras, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1707Born
16 Apr 175245.2SelectedBishop of Arras, France
25 Sep 175245.6ConfirmedBishop of Arras, France
22 Oct 175245.7Ordained BishopBishop of Arras, France
28 Feb 176962.0DiedBishop of Arras, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Bonneguise
Bishop Jean de Bonneguise (born , died ) Bishop of Arras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBadefols d’Ans

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,752, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast