Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Zbigņev Stankevičs

Archbishop of Riga, Latvia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1955 Born
16 Jun 199641.3Ordained PriestPriest of Riga, Latvia
19 Jun 201055.3AppointedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
8 Aug 201055.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
21 Aug 201055.5InstalledArchbishop of Riga, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Zbigņev Stankevičs
Archbishop Zbigņev Stankevičs (born ) Archbishop of Riga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLejasciema

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Riga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,772

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast