Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mile Bogović

Bishop Emeritus of Gospić-Senj, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1939 Born
5 Jul 196424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Rijeka (-Opatija), Croatia
4 Jun 199959.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rijeka-Senj, Croatia
4 Jun 199959.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamata
29 Jun 199959.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamata
25 May 200060.7AppointedBishop of Gospić-Senj, Croatia
4 Apr 201676.6RetiredBishop of Gospić-Senj, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Mile Bogović
Bishop Mile Bogović (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Gospić-Senj

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerovac

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gospić-Senj.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,581
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast