Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zdenko Križić, O.C.D.

Bishop of Gospić-Senj, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1953 Born
27 Jul 197017.4ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
16 Jul 197623.4Solemn VowsMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
26 Jun 197724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
4 Apr 201663.1AppointedBishop of Gospić-Senj, Croatia
25 May 201663.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gospić-Senj, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Zdenko Križić (VIAF: 305479476)
Bishop Zdenko Križić O.C.D. (born ) Bishop of Gospić-Senj

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJohovac, Bosnia and Herzegovina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gospić-Senj.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 6 Apr 2016
  • c2+: CB, 9 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,922

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast