Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valter Župan

Bishop Emeritus of Krk (Veglia), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1938 Born
8 Jul 196223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
31 Jan 199859.4AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
15 Mar 199859.5Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
24 Jan 201576.4RetiredBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Valter Župan (VIAF: 305610587)
Bishop Valter Župan (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Krk (Veglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCunski

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Krk (Veglia).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,249
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast