Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anton Tamarut

Deceased

Archbishop of Rijeka, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1932Born
29 Jun 195724.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 198653.1AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
16 Mar 198653.2Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
4 Dec 198755.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rijeka-Senj, Croatia
5 Jan 199057.0SucceededArchbishop of Rijeka-Senj, Croatia
28 Jun 200067.5DiedArchbishop of Rijeka, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Anton Tamarut
Archbishop Anton Tamarut (born , died ) Archbishop of Rijeka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNovalja

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast