Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio Amílcar Bethancourt Fioravanti

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Rosa de Lima, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1937Born
29 Dec 196326.7Ordained PriestPriest of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala
3 Dec 198245.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala
3 Dec 198245.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pomaria
31 Jan 198345.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pomaria
4 Apr 198446.9AppointedBishop of San Marcos, Guatemala
10 Mar 198850.9AppointedBishop of Huehuetenango, Guatemala
27 Apr 199659.0AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa de Lima, Guatemala
4 Jul 200669.2DiedBishop of Santa Rosa de Lima, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Julio Amílcar Bethancourt Fioravanti
Bishop Julio Amílcar Bethancourt Fioravanti (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Rosa de Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuezaltenango, Diocese of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos
Ordained BishopGuatemala City, Archdiocese of Guatemala

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Number 7,088

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast