Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Eduardo Antonio Calderón Cruz

Bishop of San Francisco de Asís de Jutiapa, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1959 Born
5 Jul 198627.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Marcos, Guatemala
25 Jan 201656.6AppointedBishop of San Francisco de Asís de Jutiapa, Guatemala
23 Apr 201656.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Francisco de Asís de Jutiapa, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Félix Eduardo Antonio Calderón Cruz
Bishop Félix Eduardo Antonio Calderón Cruz (born ) Bishop of San Francisco de Asís de Jutiapa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuatemala City

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Francisco de Asís de Jutiapa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2016
  • ob: CB, 3 Feb 2016
  • mn: CB, 23 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,898

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast