Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-François Besson

Deceased

Bishop of Metz, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1756Born
18 Dec 177923.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Oct 182367.0SelectedBishop of Metz, France
24 Nov 182367.1ConfirmedBishop of Metz, France
23 Feb 182467.4Ordained BishopBishop of Metz, France
23 Jul 184285.8DiedBishop of Metz, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-François Besson (VIAF: 22133430)
Bishop Jacques-François Besson (born , died ) Bishop of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeyssel

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 263
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast