Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bruno Tommasi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lucca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1930Born
6 Jul 195828.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lucca, Italy
10 Jun 198353.4AppointedBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
10 Jun 198353.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Apuania, Italy
12 Jul 198353.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
23 Feb 198858.1AppointedBishop of Massa Carrara-Pontremoli, Italy
20 Mar 199161.1AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
19 May 199161.3InstalledArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
22 Jan 200575.0RetiredArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
17 Sep 201585.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bruno Tommasi (VIAF: 89690730)
Archbishop Bruno Tommasi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lucca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontignoso, Diocese of Massa Carrara
Ordained PriestCathedral, Lucca, Archdiocese of Lucca
Death PlaceViareggio, Archdiocese of Lucca
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Lucca, Archdiocese of Lucca
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Lucca, Archdiocese of Lucca

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 17 Sep 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)
  • opd/c1/loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Aug 2018

Quantcast