Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto Vásquez Ochoa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Espinal, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1909Born
3 Dec 193930.0Ordained PriestPriest of Garzón, Colombia
22 Dec 195647.1AppointedBishop of Espinal, Colombia
28 Apr 195747.4Ordained BishopBishop of Espinal, Colombia
12 Dec 197465.1ResignedBishop of Espinal, Colombia
21 Jul 198070.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Espinal, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Vásquez Ochoa
Bishop Jacinto Vásquez Ochoa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Espinal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarqui

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast