Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luciano Angeloni

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Vibo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1917BornImperia
18 Aug 194022.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Dec 197053.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Vibo
24 Dec 197053.1AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Malawi
24 Dec 197053.1AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Zambia
7 Feb 197153.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Vibo
25 Nov 197861.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Korea
21 Aug 198264.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lebanon
31 Jul 198971.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
15 Mar 199375.3RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
9 May 199678.4DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

MicroData Summary for Luciano Angeloni:
Archbishop Luciano Angeloni (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Portugal

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 6 Nov 2014