Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Bertazzoni

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Carrara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1865BornSan Rocco
6 Apr 188924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Guastalla, Italy
30 Jun 191752.2AppointedBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
12 Sep 191752.4Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
21 Oct 191752.5InstalledBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
2 Jul 193368.2DiedBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bertazzoni:
Bishop Giuseppe Bertazzoni (born , died ) Bishop of Massa Carrara

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 41
  • c1/i: CB, 31 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 2 Jan 2015