Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Jean de Bertin

Deceased

Bishop of Vannes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1712¹Born
17 Apr 174634.2SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
22 Aug 174634.6ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
25 Sep 174634.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
23 Sep 177462.7DiedBishop of Vannes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Jean de Bertin
Bishop Charles-Jean de Bertin (born 1712, died ) Bishop of Vannes

EventPlace
Birth PlacePérigueux

  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 436
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast