Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François Dondel

Deceased

Bishop of Dol, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1694¹Born
25 Aug 174854.6SelectedBishop of Dol, France
16 Dec 174854.9ConfirmedBishop of Dol, France
16 Feb 174955.1Ordained BishopBishop of Dol, France
11 Feb 176773.1DiedBishop of Dol, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-François Dondel
Bishop Jean-François Dondel (born 1694, died ) Bishop of Dol

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVannes, Diocese of Vannes

  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 198

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast